Massachusetts
Franklin
Conway
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
90276
1855
FDIC Certificate Number: 90276
FDIC's unique number: 17866
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 134905
Report Date: 1999-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-28
1855-03-28 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: United Savings Bank.
1985-10-23 Became FDIC insured.
1995-02-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1995-03-02 Changed name to United Bank .
1999-09-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Bank of Western Massachusetts in Springfield, Massachusetts.
2003-04-21 Moved bank headquarters from Conway, Massachusetts to Springfield, Massachusetts.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $277,204,000
Total deposits: $244,750,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
United Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22879