Kentucky – Henry – Campbellsburg
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.unitedcitizensbank.com
Kentucky
Henry
Campbellsburg
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15249
1872
FDIC Certificate Number: 15249
FDIC's unique number: 9599
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 336147
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1872-01-01 Institution established. Original name: United Citizens Bank & Trust Company.
1975-11-01 Acquired United Farmers Bank in Campbellsburg, Kentucky.
1976-02-26 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1993-08-19 Moved bank headquarters from New Castle, Kentucky to Campbellsburg, Kentucky.
Total assets: $88,242,000
Total deposits: $66,310,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $66,310,000
Equity capital: $11,438,000
Net income: $469,000
Return on Assets: 1.09
Return on Equity: 8.32
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: United Citizens Financial Corporation
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company - Carrollton Office Branch
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company - New Castle Branch
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company - Pendleton Branch
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company - Port Royal Branch
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company - United Citizens Bank & Tr
No associations
LandOfFree
United Citizens Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Citizens Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Citizens Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27232