United Credit Card Bank, National Association

Louisiana – East Baton Rouge – Baton Rouge

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

Bank class

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

Status

inactive

FDIC number

34293

Established

1998

Other info

FDIC Certificate Number: 34293
FDIC's unique number: 57052
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2699752
Report Date: 1999-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23169
The date of the last data update: 1999-10-28

History

1998-06-01 Institution established. Original name: United Credit Card Bank, National Association.
1999-09-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Financial data

Total assets: $2,506,000
Total deposits: $500,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United Credit Card Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United Credit Card Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Credit Card Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10930

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.