Missouri – St. Louis (city) – Saint Louis
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Missouri
St. Louis (city)
Saint Louis
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
13805
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 13805
FDIC's unique number: 8630
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 823357
Report Date: 1994-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21028
The date of the last data update: 1998-04-11
1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: United Missouri Bank Of Ferguson.
1985-04-01 Acquired United Missouri Bank Of Kirkwood in Kirkwood, Missouri.
1985-04-01 Changed name to United Missouri Bank Of St. Louis County .
1985-04-01 Moved bank headquarters from Ferguson, Missouri to Kirkwood, Missouri.
1985-12-02 Moved bank headquarters from Kirkwood, Missouri to Clayton, Missouri.
1986-04-15 Acquired United Missouri Bank Of Jefferson County in Arnold, Missouri.
1986-04-15 Changed name to United Missouri Bank Of St. Louis, National Association .
1986-04-15 Acquired United Missouri Bank Of St. Louis, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
1987-03-16 Moved bank headquarters from Clayton, Missouri to St. Louis, Missouri.
1994-12-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of UMB Bank of St. Louis, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
1999-09-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of UMB Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
2000-03-04 Acquired Charter National Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2000-03-04 Acquired Umb Oklahoma Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2004-08-01 Acquired Umb U.s.a., National Association in Falls City, Nebraska.
2004-12-04 Acquired Umb Bank Omaha, National Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
2007-12-08 Acquired Umb Bank, Warsaw, National Association in Warsaw, Missouri.
Total assets: $549,315,000
Total deposits: $379,588,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
United Missouri Bank of St. Louis, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Missouri Bank of St. Louis, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Missouri Bank of St. Louis, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20342