Pennsylvania – Philadelphia – Philadelphia
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
www.unitedsavingsbank.com
Pennsylvania
Philadelphia
Philadelphia
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
28836
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 28836
FDIC's unique number: 41670
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 459372
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-10-31
1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: United Savings Association.
1991-06-07 Changed name to United Savings Bank .
1991-06-07 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
Total assets: $310,015,000
Total deposits: $246,690,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $246,690,000
Equity capital: $47,478,000
Net income: $1,130,000
Return on Assets: 0.73
Return on Equity: 4.82
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
United Savings Bank - 10th Street Branch
United Savings Bank - Broomall Branch
United Savings Bank - Marconi Branch
United Savings Bank - Media Branch
United Savings Bank - Springfield Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
United Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26956