Minnesota – Lyon – Cottonwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.unitedswbank.com
Minnesota
Lyon
Cottonwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
10208
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 10208
FDIC's unique number: 6547
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 343257
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1916-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Empire State Bank.
1997-01-01 Acquired United Southwest Bank in Vesta, Minnesota.
1997-01-01 Changed name to United Southwest Bank .
Total assets: $39,882,000
Total deposits: $36,313,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $36,313,000
Equity capital: $3,238,000
Net income: $37,000
Return on Assets: 0.18
Return on Equity: 2.41
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Empire Bancshares, Inc.
United Southwest Bank - 176 South Broadway Branch
United Southwest Bank - Detached Facility
United Southwest Bank - Marshall Branch
United Southwest Bank - United Southwest Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
United Southwest Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Southwest Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Southwest Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1932