Minnesota – Redwood – Vesta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Redwood
Vesta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
16313
1945
FDIC Certificate Number: 16313
FDIC's unique number: 10500
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato
Federal Reserve ID Number: 897059
Report Date: 1996-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-02-04
1945-10-01 Institution established. Original name: Vesta State Bank.
1993-08-16 Changed name to United Southwest Bank .
1997-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Southwest Bank in Cottonwood, Minnesota.
Total assets: $13,022,000
Total deposits: $12,093,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
United Southwest Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Southwest Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Southwest Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19699