Texas – Bexar – San Antonio
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Bexar
San Antonio
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
22457
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 22457
FDIC's unique number: 15654
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 697464
Report Date: 1989-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16649
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1977-04-28 Institution established. Original name: University National Bank.
1989-08-03 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Frost National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1989-10-27 Acquired First National Bank in Boerne, Texas.
1989-10-27 Acquired Fair Oaks National Bank in Bexar County, Texas.
1991-06-07 Acquired Portland State Bank in Portland, Texas.
1993-02-13 Acquired New First City, Texas - Austin, National Association in Austin, Texas.
1993-02-13 Acquired New First City, Texas - San Antonio, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1993-10-01 Changed name to The Frost National Bank .
1993-11-05 Acquired Cullen Center Bank & Trust in Houston, Texas.
1994-04-14 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Corpus Christi, National Association in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1995-05-19 Acquired National Commerce Bank in Houston, Texas.
1995-06-23 Acquired The Valley National Bank in Mcallen, Texas.
1996-03-22 Acquired State Bank And Trust Company in San Marcos, Texas.
1996-06-07 Acquired Park National Bank Of Houston in Houston, Texas.
1997-03-07 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Corpus Christi in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1998-01-02 Acquired Harrisburg Bank, Houston, Texas in Houston, Texas.
1998-05-29 Acquired Overton Bank And Trust, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
1999-01-14 Acquired Keller State Bank in Keller, Texas.
1999-05-20 Acquired Bank Of Commerce in Fort Worth, Texas.
2000-05-26 Acquired United States National Bank Of Galveston in Galveston, Texas.
2005-10-07 Acquired Horizon Capital Bank in Houston, Texas.
2006-02-09 Acquired Texas Community Bank And Trust, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2006-06-23 Acquired Alamo Bank Of Texas in Alamo, Texas.
2006-12-08 Acquired Summit Bank, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
Total assets: $19,844,000
Total deposits: $22,491,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
University National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with University National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and University National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18716