Texas – Bexar – San Antonio
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.usaa.com
Texas
Bexar
San Antonio
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
32188
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 32188
FDIC's unique number: 45022
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 619877
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 708E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-09-22
1983-12-30 Institution established. Original name: Usaa Federal Savings Bank.
1993-04-01 Acquired Usaa Financial Services Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1993-04-01 Acquired Usaa Credit Card Bank in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1994-12-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1995-04-19 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $48,783,813,000
Total deposits: $43,839,346,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $43,839,346,000
Equity capital: $4,101,706,000
Net income: $267,113,000
Return on Assets: 1.13
Return on Equity: 13.45
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Usaa Federal Savings Bank - Usaa Federal Savings Bank
Usaa Federal Savings Bank - Usaa Fsb - Annapolis Branch
Usaa Federal Savings Bank - Usaa Fsb - Arlington Branch
Usaa Federal Savings Bank - Usaa Fsb - Colorado Springs
Usaa Federal Savings Bank - Usaa Fsb - Forum Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
USAA Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with USAA Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and USAA Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3954