Indiana – Porter – Chesterton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Indiana
Porter
Chesterton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
29674
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 29674
FDIC's unique number: 42508
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago
Federal Reserve ID Number: 103376
Report Date: 1991-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-07-18
1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Northern Indiana Savings Association.
1986-03-31 Changed name to Northern Indiana Savings Association, FA .
1991-05-31 Reorganized.
1991-05-31 Changed name to Valley Savings Bank .
1991-05-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1991-05-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1991-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Valley American Bank and Trust Company in South Bend, Indiana.
1998-11-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank of Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
Total assets: $53,608,000
Total deposits: $50,854,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Valley Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Valley Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Valley Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2351