New Hampshire – Rockingham – Exeter
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Exeter
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
29649
1936
FDIC Certificate Number: 29649
FDIC's unique number: 42483
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 462372
Report Date: 1997-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23488
The date of the last data update: 2000-03-14
1936-03-13 Institution established. Original name: Vermont Federal Bank, Fsb.
1981-11-30 Acquired Randolph Savings And Loan Association in Randolph, Vermont.
1981-11-30 Acquired Middlebury Savings And Loan Association in Middlebury, Vermont.
1983-08-31 Acquired Windsor Federal Savings And Loan Association in Windsor, Vermont.
1992-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from Burlington, Vermont to Williston, Vermont.
1995-10-01 Acquired First Savings And Loan Association Of New Hampshire in Exeter, New Hampshire.
1997-09-22 Changed name to Vermont Federal National Bank .
1997-09-22 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-09-22 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1997-09-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Vermont National Bank in Brattleboro, Vermont.
2000-03-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Chittenden Trust Company in Burlington, Vermont.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $809,714,000
Total deposits: $646,364,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Vermont Federal National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Vermont Federal National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Vermont Federal National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12692