New Hampshire – Belknap – Laconia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.vbtnh.com
New Hampshire
Belknap
Laconia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
23675
1982
FDIC Certificate Number: 23675
FDIC's unique number: 16564
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 251008
Report Date: 2005-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2005-10-19
1982-02-16 Institution established. Original name: Village Bank & Trust Company.
1985-01-15 Reorganized.
2005-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Laconia Savings Bank in Laconia, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $77,072,000
Total deposits: $67,387,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Village Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Village Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Village Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8798