Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
27088
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 27088
FDIC's unique number: 38734
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1158177
Report Date: 1993-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21455
The date of the last data update: 1994-01-06
1987-10-23 Institution established. Original name: Vinings Bank & Trust, National Association.
1993-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Summit National Bank in De Kalb County, Georgia.
1998-06-30 Acquired California Security Bank in San Jose, California.
2006-04-01 Acquired Concord Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-12-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Commercial Bank in San Francisco, California.
2007-05-24 Acquired The Chinese American Bank in New York, New York.
2009-11-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of East West Bank in Pasadena, California.
2009-11-06 FDIC closing information for
United Commercial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/ucb.html.
Total assets: $20,422,000
Total deposits: $17,561,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Vinings Bank & Trust, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Vinings Bank & Trust, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Vinings Bank & Trust, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27138