Georgia – Ware – Waycross
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.waycrossbankandtrust.com
Georgia
Ware
Waycross
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
27254
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 27254
FDIC's unique number: 39342
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Savannah
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1191352
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1988-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Waycross Bank & Trust.
1990-01-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $156,242,000
Total deposits: $140,771,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $140,771,000
Equity capital: $14,589,000
Net income: $472,000
Return on Assets: 0.64
Return on Equity: 7.02
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Wb&T Bankshares, Inc.
Waycross Bank & Trust - Brunswick Branch
Waycross Bank & Trust - South Coast Bank And Trust - Retreat
Waycross Bank & Trust - Waycross Bank & Trust
No associations
LandOfFree
Waycross Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Waycross Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Waycross Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7958