West Virginia – Tyler – Sistersville
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
West Virginia
Tyler
Sistersville
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
801
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 801
FDIC's unique number: 507
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 595720
Report Date: 1993-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1993-10-26
1921-06-29 Institution established. Original name: First-tyler Bank & Trust Company.
1991-07-01 Changed name to Wesbanco Bank Sistersville .
1993-09-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wesbanco Bank Wheeling in Wheeling, West Virginia.
1994-04-05 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Wellsburg, Inc. in Wellsburg, West Virginia.
1995-02-17 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Elm Grove, Inc. in Wheeling, West Virginia.
1996-08-31 Acquired Bank Of Weirton in Weirton, West Virginia.
1998-04-01 Acquired The Bank Of Mcmechen in Mcmechen, West Virginia.
1998-04-01 Acquired The Bank Of Paden City in Paden City, West Virginia.
1998-07-17 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Barnesville in Barnesville, Ohio.
2000-01-15 Changed name to Wesbanco Bank, Inc. .
2000-01-15 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Parkersburg in Parkersburg, West Virginia.
2000-01-15 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Fairmont, Inc. in Fairmont, West Virginia.
2000-01-15 Acquired Wesbanco Bank Charleston in Charleston, West Virginia.
2002-03-01 Acquired Wheeling National Bank in St. Clairsville, Ohio.
2004-09-01 Acquired Cornerstone Bank in Springfield, Ohio.
2005-01-03 Acquired The Winton Savings And Loan Company in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2008-02-15 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2008-02-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2008-04-25 Acquired Oak Hill Banks in Jackson, Ohio.
Total assets: $22,709,000
Total deposits: $15,121,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Wesbanco Bank Sistersville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Wesbanco Bank Sistersville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Wesbanco Bank Sistersville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3632