Kentucky – Hardin – Radcliff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.westpointbank.com
Kentucky
Hardin
Radcliff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
12166
1914
FDIC Certificate Number: 12166
FDIC's unique number: 7727
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 79042
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1914-07-01 Institution established. Original name: The West Point Bank.
1988-11-28 Moved bank headquarters from West Point, Kentucky to Radcliff, Kentucky.
1988-11-28 Changed name to West Point National Bank .
1993-11-04 Changed name to West Point Bank .
1993-11-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $134,981,000
Total deposits: $75,485,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $75,485,000
Equity capital: $14,962,000
Net income: $679,000
Return on Assets: 1.02
Return on Equity: 9.25
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Breckinridge Bancshares, Inc.
West Point Bank - Glendale Branch
West Point Bank - Upton Branch
West Point Bank - West Point Ban K
West Point Bank - West Point Bank
West Point Bank - West Point Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
West Point Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with West Point Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and West Point Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15056