Massachusetts – Hampden – West Springfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.westbankonline.com
Massachusetts
Hampden
West Springfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18532
1962
FDIC Certificate Number: 18532
FDIC's unique number: 12424
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 893800
Report Date: 2006-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-02-22
1962-06-23 Institution established. Original name: Western Bank And Trust Company.
1976-07-16 Acquired The Park National Bank Of Holyoke in Holyoke, Massachusetts.
1976-07-16 Changed name to Park West Bank And Trust Company .
1990-02-26 Acquired Chicopee Co-operative Bank in Chicopee, Massachusetts.
2001-09-07 Acquired Cargill Bank Of Connecticut in Danielson, Connecticut.
2001-09-07 Changed name to Westbank .
2007-01-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NewAlliance Bank in New Haven, Connecticut.
2011-04-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Niagara Bank, National Association in Buffalo, New York.
Total assets: $714,325,000
Total deposits: $629,270,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Westbank has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 1.39 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is very bad.
If you have personal experience with Westbank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Westbank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
still po'd in holyoke
Takes FOREVER to get anything resolved, numerous phone calls and visits to different branches to try and get problems resolved...........what a pita!!!!!!!!!!!!!!
Was this review helpful to you? Rating [ 1.39 ]
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4544