Kentucky – Nelson – Bardstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.wilsonmuirbank.com
Kentucky
Nelson
Bardstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
17040
1865
FDIC Certificate Number: 17040
FDIC's unique number: 11103
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 899343
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1865-12-18 Institution established. Original name: Muir, Wilson & Muir.
1982-12-02 Acquired Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company in Bardstown, Kentucky.
1982-12-02 Changed name to Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company .
1982-12-02 Moved bank headquarters from Bloomfield, Kentucky to Bardstown, Kentucky.
1999-11-29 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Vine Grove in Vine Grove, Kentucky.
2001-07-20 Acquired The Citizens Bank And Trust Company Of Grayson County in Leitchfield, Kentucky.
Total assets: $398,546,000
Total deposits: $348,945,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $348,945,000
Equity capital: $34,817,000
Net income: $2,769,000
Return on Assets: 1.38
Return on Equity: 15.84
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Wilson & Muir Bancorp, Inc.
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company - Big Clifty Branch
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company - Bloomfield Branch
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company - Culpeper Branch
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company - Drive-In Facility
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company - Elizabethtown Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19726