Montana – Stillwater – Absarokee
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Montana
Stillwater
Absarokee
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
18828
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 18828
FDIC's unique number: 12684
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 780656
Report Date: 1996-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1996-10-31
1963-04-15 Institution established. Original name: Yellowstone Bank, Absarokee, Montana.
1996-10-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Yellowstone Bank in Laurel, Montana.
Total assets: $16,004,000
Total deposits: $12,379,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Yellowstone Bank, Absarokee, Montana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Yellowstone Bank, Absarokee, Montana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Yellowstone Bank, Absarokee, Montana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11374