South Dakota – Jerauld – Wessington Springs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.americanbanktrust.net
South Dakota
Jerauld
Wessington Springs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1117
1892
FDIC Certificate Number: 1117
FDIC's unique number: 760
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 275358
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1892-01-01 Institution established. Original name: American State Bank.
1994-01-18 Acquired Farmers State Bank Of Mellette in Mellette, South Dakota.
2000-06-01 Acquired Hand County State Bank in Miller, South Dakota.
2002-04-01 Changed name to American Bank & Trust .
2002-04-12 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2011-10-03 Acquired Peoples State Bank in De Smet, South Dakota.
Total assets: $290,342,000
Total deposits: $233,131,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $233,131,000
Equity capital: $32,778,000
Net income: $2,154,000
Return on Assets: 1.49
Return on Equity: 13.64
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Leackco Bank Holding Company, Inc.
American Bank & Trust - Alpena Branch
American Bank & Trust - American Bank & Trust
American Bank & Trust - Huron Branch
American Bank & Trust - Huron Wal-Mart
American Bank & Trust - Mellette Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
American Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18745