Texas – Wichita – Wichita Falls
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.amnat.com
Texas
Wichita
Wichita Falls
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
22373
1976
FDIC Certificate Number: 22373
FDIC's unique number: 15580
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 498362
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16617
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-14
1976-11-29 Institution established. Original name: American National Bank.
1995-01-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-05-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $449,785,000
Total deposits: $385,015,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $385,015,000
Equity capital: $44,611,000
Net income: $1,336,000
Return on Assets: 0.58
Return on Equity: 6.1
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ameribancshares, Inc.
American National Bank - 219 West Park Branch
American National Bank - American National Bank
American National Bank - Archer City Branch
American National Bank - Downtown Wichita Falls Branch
American National Bank - Elmwood Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
American National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18126