www.androscogginbank.com
Maine
Androscoggin
Lewiston
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
17751
1870
FDIC Certificate Number: 17751
FDIC's unique number: 11706
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 132107
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-01
1870-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Androscoggin County Savings Bank.
1974-05-28 Changed name to Androscoggin Savings Bank .
1993-05-14 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-01-08 Reorganized.
1999-01-08 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1999-01-16 Acquired Livermore Falls Trust Company in Livermore Falls, Maine.
Total assets: $699,609,000
Total deposits: $517,279,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $517,279,000
Equity capital: $74,531,000
Net income: $1,819,000
Return on Assets: 0.52
Return on Equity: 4.96
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Androscoggin Bancorp, Mhc
Androscoggin Savings Bank - Androscoggin Savings Bank
Androscoggin Savings Bank - Brunswick Branch
Androscoggin Savings Bank - Brunswick Branch
Androscoggin Savings Bank - Gray Branch
Androscoggin Savings Bank - Jay Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Androscoggin Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Androscoggin Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Androscoggin Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22635