Oklahoma – Muskogee – Muskogee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.armstrongbank.com
Oklahoma
Muskogee
Muskogee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
2315
1910
FDIC Certificate Number: 2315
FDIC's unique number: 1532
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 470452
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 17
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-01-14
1910-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Vian State Bank.
1988-07-14 Acquired The Security Bank in Warner, Oklahoma.
1991-07-19 Acquired Sequoyah State Bank Of Muldrow in Muldrow, Oklahoma.
1994-07-01 Acquired Lake Country Bank in Webbers Falls, Oklahoma.
1996-04-22 Changed name to Armstrong Bank .
1999-07-08 Moved bank headquarters from Vian, Oklahoma to Checotah, Oklahoma.
2001-03-16 Moved bank headquarters from Checotah, Oklahoma to Muskogee, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $573,932,000
Total deposits: $500,357,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $500,357,000
Equity capital: $60,232,000
Net income: $5,488,000
Return on Assets: 1.92
Return on Equity: 19.43
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ironhorse Financial Group, Inc.
Armstrong Bank - Armstrong Bank
Armstrong Bank - Bartlesville Branch
Armstrong Bank - Chandler Branch
Armstrong Bank - Checotah Branch
Armstrong Bank - Dewey Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Armstrong Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Armstrong Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Armstrong Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3276