Missouri – Adair – Kirksville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bankofkirksville.com
Missouri
Adair
Kirksville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1635
1913
FDIC Certificate Number: 1635
FDIC's unique number: 1072
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 796451
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1913-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Kirksville.
1996-04-12 Acquired Bank Of Downing in Downing, Missouri.
Total assets: $464,438,000
Total deposits: $386,719,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $386,719,000
Equity capital: $42,198,000
Net income: $2,305,000
Return on Assets: 1.01
Return on Equity: 11.36
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Rockhold Bancorp
Bank Of Kirksville - Bank Of Downing, A Division Of Bank Of Kirk
Bank Of Kirksville - Bank Of Kirksville
Bank Of Kirksville - Bank Of La Plata-A Division Of Bank
Bank Of Kirksville - Bank Of Macon-A Division Of Bank Of
Bank Of Kirksville - Bank Of Memphis - A Division Of Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Kirksville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Kirksville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Kirksville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5034