Missouri – St. Louis (city) – Saint Louis
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bremenbank.com
Missouri
St. Louis (city)
Saint Louis
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1067
1868
FDIC Certificate Number: 1067
FDIC's unique number: 716
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 534653
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1868-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bremen Bank And Trust Company.
1927-12-29 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Grandfathered.
Total assets: $222,821,000
Total deposits: $177,682,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $177,682,000
Equity capital: $20,930,000
Net income: $274,000
Return on Assets: 0.24
Return on Equity: 2.66
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bremen Bancorp, Inc.
Bremen Bank And Trust Company - Bremen Bank And Trust Company
Bremen Bank And Trust Company - Clayton Office
Bremen Bank And Trust Company - Friendship Village Branch
Bremen Bank And Trust Company - Hazelwood Branch
Bremen Bank And Trust Company - Manchester Road Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Bremen Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bremen Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bremen Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6336