Louisiana – St. Tammany – Lacombe
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.cpb.com
Louisiana
St. Tammany
Lacombe
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
19657
1967
FDIC Certificate Number: 19657
FDIC's unique number: 13456
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge
Federal Reserve ID Number: 185037
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 18
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1967-01-03 Institution established. Original name: Central Progressive Bank Of Amite.
1986-01-02 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1988-11-17 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1999-11-19 Moved bank headquarters from Amite, Louisiana to Hammond, Louisiana.
1999-11-19 Changed name to Central Progressive Bank .
2003-06-25 Moved bank headquarters from Hammond, Louisiana to Lacombe, Louisiana.
Total assets: $397,931,000
Total deposits: $349,528,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $349,528,000
Equity capital: $22,130,000
Net income: $-9,018,000
Return on Assets: -4.39
Return on Equity: -64.42
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Blossman Bancshares, Inc.
Central Progressive Bank - Amite Branch
Central Progressive Bank - Bogalusa Branch
Central Progressive Bank - Brown Switch Road Branch
Central Progressive Bank - Causeway Branch
Central Progressive Bank - Central Progressive Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Central Progressive Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Central Progressive Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Progressive Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9254