New York – Essex – Elizabethtown
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.champlainbank.com
New York
Essex
Elizabethtown
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
7356
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 7356
FDIC's unique number: 4811
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse
Federal Reserve ID Number: 126012
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9405
Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-12-22
1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Essex County-champlain National Bank, Willsboro.
1986-07-31 Reorganized.
1986-07-31 Changed name to Essex County-champlain National Bank .
1991-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from Willsboro, New York to Elizabethtown, New York.
1991-03-18 Changed name to Champlain National Bank .
Total assets: $219,503,000
Total deposits: $185,706,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $185,706,000
Equity capital: $18,098,000
Net income: $881,000
Return on Assets: 0.81
Return on Equity: 10.41
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Champlain Bank Corporation
Champlain National Bank - Champlain Branch
Champlain National Bank - Champlain National Bank
Champlain National Bank - Crown Point Branch
Champlain National Bank - Keene Branch
Champlain National Bank - Lake Placid Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Champlain National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Champlain National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Champlain National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26903