Missouri – Livingston – Chillicothe
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ebankcbt.com
Missouri
Livingston
Chillicothe
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
4533
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 4533
FDIC's unique number: 2999
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 381343
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 23
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-25
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens National Bank Of Chillicothe.
1978-07-20 Changed name to Citizens Bank And Trust Company .
1986-12-04 Acquired The Ludlow National Bank in Ludlow, Missouri.
1987-02-13 Acquired First State Bank Of King City, Missouri in King City, Missouri.
1993-04-26 Acquired First Security Bank Of Brookfield in Brookfield, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired Trenton Trust Company in Trenton, Missouri.
1999-10-13 Acquired Macon Building And Loan Association, F.A. in Macon, Missouri.
2008-08-22 Acquired The Columbian Bank And Trust Company in Topeka, Kansas as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $972,844,000
Total deposits: $828,899,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $828,899,000
Equity capital: $92,533,000
Net income: $1,663,000
Return on Assets: 0.34
Return on Equity: 3.68
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Young Partners, L.P.
Citizens Bank And Trust Company - Barry Road Branch
Citizens Bank And Trust Company - Boonville Spring Branch
Citizens Bank And Trust Company - Brookfield Branch
Citizens Bank And Trust Company - Burlington Junction Branch
Citizens Bank And Trust Company - Chillicothe Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8650