Louisiana – Bossier – Bossier City
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.citizensnb.com
Louisiana
Bossier
Bossier City
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
26381
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 26381
FDIC's unique number: 32985
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 594853
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 20184
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1985-10-07 Institution established. Original name: Citizens National Bank Of Bossier City Louisiana.
1995-11-01 Reorganized.
1995-11-01 Changed name to Citizens National Bank Of Bossier City, Louisiana .
2002-06-01 Changed name to Citizens National Bank, N.A. .
Total assets: $452,672,000
Total deposits: $405,240,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $405,240,000
Equity capital: $40,512,000
Net income: $2,371,000
Return on Assets: 1.08
Return on Equity: 12.24
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Citizens National Bancshares Of Bossier, Inc.
Citizens National Bank, N.A. - Benton Road Branch
Citizens National Bank, N.A. - Citizens National Bank, N.A.
Citizens National Bank, N.A. - Cnb, Na - Downtown Mansfield Bran
Citizens National Bank, N.A. - Downtown Shreveport Branch
Citizens National Bank, N.A. - East 70th Street Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens National Bank, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens National Bank, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens National Bank, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3485