Kentucky – Shelby – Shelbyville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.cubbank.com
Kentucky
Shelby
Shelbyville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
5840
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 5840
FDIC's unique number: 3994
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 65746
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 16
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-16
1888-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Union Bank.
1970-10-01 Acquired Bank Of Simpsonville in Simpsonville, Kentucky.
1984-12-31 Reorganized.
1984-12-31 Changed name to Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville .
1986-08-01 Acquired Farmers & Traders Bank in Shelbyville, Kentucky.
1998-11-16 Moved bank headquarters from Shelbyville, Kentucky to Taylorsville, Kentucky.
2000-08-14 Moved bank headquarters from Taylorsville, Kentucky to Shelbyville, Kentucky.
2003-06-14 Acquired The Peoples State Bank in Hodgenville, Kentucky.
2007-05-31 Acquired Fort Knox National Bank in Radcliff, Kentucky.
Total assets: $594,108,000
Total deposits: $493,297,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $493,297,000
Equity capital: $53,798,000
Net income: $-900,000
Return on Assets: -0.29
Return on Equity: -3.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Lea M. Mcmullan Trust
Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville - Bagdad Branch
Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville - Blankenbaker Branch
Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville - Chamberlain Lane Branch
Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville - Citizens Union Bank Of Shel
Citizens Union Bank Of Shelbyville - Cool Springs Retail Center
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Union Bank of Shelbyville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Union Bank of Shelbyville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Union Bank of Shelbyville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20708