Kansas – Labette – Parsons
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.commercialbank.net
Kansas
Labette
Parsons
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
11777
1874
FDIC Certificate Number: 11777
FDIC's unique number: 7532
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 296559
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1874-05-30 Institution established. Original name: Parsons Commercial Bank.
1925-08-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Grandfathered.
1985-09-24 Acquired The State Bank Of Parsons in Parsons, Kansas.
1989-05-18 Acquired First National Bank At Oswego in Oswego, Kansas.
1990-05-04 Acquired Peoples Savings And Loan Association in Parsons, Kansas.
1990-05-04 Acquired Mid-america Federal Savings And Loan Association in Parsons, Kansas.
1990-08-28 Changed name to Commercial Bank .
Total assets: $232,477,000
Total deposits: $194,784,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $194,784,000
Equity capital: $30,053,000
Net income: $1,776,000
Return on Assets: 1.52
Return on Equity: 11.55
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Commercial Bank - Chanute Branch
Commercial Bank - Commercial Bank
Commercial Bank - Erie Branch
Commercial Bank - Independence Branch
Commercial Bank - Oswego Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Commercial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Commercial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commercial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13608