Missouri – Newton – Neosho
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.cbthomebank.com
Missouri
Newton
Neosho
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
13068
1884
FDIC Certificate Number: 13068
FDIC's unique number: 8261
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 957757
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 14
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1884-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Neosho.
1993-02-12 Acquired The Anderson State Bank in Anderson, Missouri.
1993-02-12 Changed name to Community Bank And Trust .
1993-02-12 Acquired The Citizens' State Bank Of Granby in Granby, Missouri.
1995-05-19 Acquired State Bank Of Seneca in Seneca, Missouri.
1997-04-18 Acquired Diamond Bank in Diamond, Missouri.
1997-09-05 Acquired Citizens State Bank In Galena in Galena, Kansas.
Total assets: $291,949,000
Total deposits: $251,295,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $251,295,000
Equity capital: $27,467,000
Net income: $1,781,000
Return on Assets: 1.27
Return on Equity: 13.49
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Community Bancshares Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Community Bank And Trust - Branch 02
Community Bank And Trust - Branch 03
Community Bank And Trust - Branch 04
Community Bank And Trust - Branch 05
Community Bank And Trust - Branch 06
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17391