Vermont – Orleans – Derby
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.communitynationalbank.com
Vermont
Orleans
Derby
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
6271
1851
FDIC Certificate Number: 6271
FDIC's unique number: 4235
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 270504
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1368
Number of Domestic Offices: 15
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-02
1851-01-15 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Derby Line.
1975-07-01 Acquired The Island Pond National Bank in Island Pond, Vermont.
1975-07-01 Changed name to Community National Bank .
1980-06-02 Moved bank headquarters from Derby Line, Vermont to Derby, Vermont.
2008-01-01 Acquired Lyndonbank in Lyndonville, Vermont.
Total assets: $512,680,000
Total deposits: $417,480,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $417,480,000
Equity capital: $52,310,000
Net income: $2,245,000
Return on Assets: 0.85
Return on Equity: 8.66
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Community Bancorp
Community National Bank - Barre Branch
Community National Bank - Barton Branch
Community National Bank - Community National Bank
Community National Bank - Derby Line Branch
Community National Bank - Drive-In Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Community National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7707