Vermont – Windsor – Springfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.crbna.com
Vermont
Windsor
Springfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
6209
1864
FDIC Certificate Number: 6209
FDIC's unique number: 4186
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 40707
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23137
Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-16
1864-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Connecticut River National Bank.
1977-08-01 Changed name to Connecticut River Bank .
1996-10-01 Changed name to Connecticut River Bank, National Association .
1996-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from Charlestown, New Hampshire to Springfield, Vermont.
2000-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank Of Littleton in Littleton, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $260,393,000
Total deposits: $233,641,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $233,641,000
Equity capital: $21,140,000
Net income: $496,000
Return on Assets: 0.38
Return on Equity: 4.74
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Connecticut River Bancorp, Inc.
Connecticut River Bank, National Association - Bethlehem Branch
Connecticut River Bank, National Association - Charlestown Branc
Connecticut River Bank, National Association - Claremont Branch
Connecticut River Bank, National Association - Connecticut River
Connecticut River Bank, National Association - Fall Mountain Bra
No associations
LandOfFree
Connecticut River Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Connecticut River Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Connecticut River Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24212