www.crestsavings.com
New Jersey
Cape May
Wildwood
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
28818
1919
FDIC Certificate Number: 28818
FDIC's unique number: 41652
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 172475
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-13
1919-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Crest Savings And Loan Association.
1995-01-12 Changed name to Crest Savings Bank, S.l.a. .
2000-10-17 Changed name to Crest Savings Bank .
2000-10-17 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2000-10-17 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2001-04-19 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-07-13 Moved bank headquarters from Wildwood Crest, New Jersey to Wildwood, New Jersey.
2011-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2011-06-29 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
Total assets: $371,683,000
Total deposits: $297,889,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $297,889,000
Equity capital: $29,253,000
Net income: $823,000
Return on Assets: 0.44
Return on Equity: 5.7
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Crest Savings Bank - 1890 Bayshore Road Branch
Crest Savings Bank - 3306 Bayshore Road Branch
Crest Savings Bank - 500 New Jersey Avenue Branch
Crest Savings Bank - 5500 New Jersey Avenue Branch
Crest Savings Bank - Crest Savings Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Crest Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Crest Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Crest Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6357