Kansas – Atchison – Atchison
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.myexchangebank.com
Kansas
Atchison
Atchison
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4619
1857
FDIC Certificate Number: 4619
FDIC's unique number: 3062
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 144052
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 182
Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-13
1857-02-19 Institution established. Original name: The Exchange National Bank And Trust Company Of Atchison.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants State Bank, Effingham, Kansas in Effingham, Kansas.
2011-06-04 Acquired First National Bank & Trust Co. Of Leavenworth in Leavenworth, Kansas.
2011-06-04 Changed name to Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. .
Total assets: $312,789,000
Total deposits: $266,495,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $266,495,000
Equity capital: $28,816,000
Net income: $1,624,000
Return on Assets: 1.05
Return on Equity: 11.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Exchange Bankshares Corporation Of Kansas
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. - 630 Delaware Branch
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. - Atchison Country Mart Branc
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. - Atchison Walmart Branch
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. - Drive-In Branch
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. - Easton Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Exchange National Bank & Trust Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3836