www.extracobanks.com
Texas
Bell
Temple
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
5551
1933
FDIC Certificate Number: 5551
FDIC's unique number: 3773
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 537560
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13778
Number of Domestic Offices: 19
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1933-09-20 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Temple.
1988-12-01 Acquired Texana National Bank Of Belton in Belton, Texas.
1989-08-17 Acquired Citizens National Bank Of Killeen in Killeen, Texas.
1991-11-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Temple - South in Temple, Texas.
1997-04-21 Reorganized.
1999-03-29 Changed name to Extraco Banks, National Association .
1999-05-21 Acquired Extraco Banks, National Association in Waco, Texas.
1999-06-28 Acquired Lorena State Bank in Lorena, Texas.
1999-06-28 Acquired Bank Of Troy in Troy, Texas.
2000-03-31 Acquired Guaranty Bank & Trust Company in Gatesville, Texas.
2002-12-03 Acquired Heights State Bank in Harker Heights, Texas.
Total assets: $1,184,898,000
Total deposits: $859,186,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $859,186,000
Equity capital: $113,060,000
Net income: $6,050,000
Return on Assets: 1.03
Return on Equity: 10.92
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Extraco Corporation
Extraco Banks, National Association - 31st Street Branch
Extraco Banks, National Association - Belton Branch
Extraco Banks, National Association - Bryan Branch
Extraco Banks, National Association - Copperas Cove Branch
Extraco Banks, National Association - Extraco Banks, National As
No associations
LandOfFree
Extraco Banks, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Extraco Banks, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Extraco Banks, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8346