Texas – Lubbock – Lubbock
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firstbanklubbock.com
Texas
Lubbock
Lubbock
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
14778
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 14778
FDIC's unique number: 9243
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 294564
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-08-03
1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Bank & Trust Company.
1996-12-01 Moved bank headquarters from White Deer, Texas to Lubbock, Texas.
2011-07-29 Acquired Jefferson Bank in Dallas, Texas.
Total assets: $501,535,000
Total deposits: $398,456,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $398,456,000
Equity capital: $41,705,000
Net income: $818,000
Return on Assets: 0.34
Return on Equity: 4.04
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Bank Lubbock Bancshares, Inc.
First Bank & Trust Company - First Bank & Trust Company
First Bank & Trust Company - Lockwood Branch
First Bank & Trust Company - Midcity Branch
First Bank & Trust Company - Mobile Branch
First Bank & Trust Company - Southwest Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21751