Kentucky – Pulaski – Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.firstandfarmers.com
Kentucky
Pulaski
Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
2738
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 2738
FDIC's unique number: 1777
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 721949
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6769
Number of Domestic Offices: 12
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-01
1903-10-15 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Columbia.
1991-04-01 Reorganized.
2008-02-16 Acquired First & Farmers Bank, Inc. in Albany, Kentucky.
2008-02-16 Changed name to First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. .
2008-02-16 Moved bank headquarters from Columbia, Kentucky to Somerset, Kentucky.
Total assets: $460,749,000
Total deposits: $391,555,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $391,555,000
Equity capital: $59,587,000
Net income: $1,772,000
Return on Assets: 0.78
Return on Equity: 6.12
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Albany Bancorp, Inc.
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. - 200 South Washington Stree
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. - 224 South Public Square Co
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. - Albany Branch
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. - Burkesville Branch
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. - Burnside Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First & Farmers National Bank, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First & Farmers National Bank, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17511