Louisiana – Tangipahoa – Hammond
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fgb.net
Louisiana
Tangipahoa
Hammond
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
14028
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 14028
FDIC's unique number: 8769
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge
Federal Reserve ID Number: 422433
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 16
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-11
1934-03-12 Institution established. Original name: First Guaranty Bank.
1999-12-21 Acquired First Southwest Bank in Jennings, Louisiana.
2001-01-13 Acquired First Woodlands Bank in Homer, Louisiana.
2007-07-30 Acquired Homestead Bank in Ponchatoula, Louisiana.
2011-07-01 Acquired Bank Of Greensburg in Greensburg, Louisiana.
Total assets: $1,161,098,000
Total deposits: $1,052,038,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,052,038,000
Equity capital: $98,059,000
Net income: $5,093,000
Return on Assets: 0.88
Return on Equity: 10.75
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Guaranty Bancshares, Inc.
First Guaranty Bank - Abbeville Branch
First Guaranty Bank - Amite Branch
First Guaranty Bank - Benton Branch
First Guaranty Bank - Denham Springs Branch
First Guaranty Bank - Dubach Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Guaranty Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Guaranty Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Guaranty Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16528