Missouri – Butler – Poplar Bluff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.1midwest.com
Missouri
Butler
Poplar Bluff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
19212
1964
FDIC Certificate Number: 19212
FDIC's unique number: 13030
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 228158
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1964-08-29 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Poplar Bluff.
1987-07-01 Acquired Puxico State Bank in Puxico, Missouri.
1988-03-31 Changed name to First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff .
1988-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $266,446,000
Total deposits: $223,668,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $223,668,000
Equity capital: $24,579,000
Net income: $2,424,000
Return on Assets: 1.84
Return on Equity: 20.45
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Poplar Bluff Banc Company
First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff - Columbia Banking Center Bra
First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff - East Facility
First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff - First Midwest Bank Of Popla
First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff - Kroger Facility
First Midwest Bank Of Poplar Bluff - Puxico Facility
No associations
LandOfFree
First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25259