Kentucky – Daviess – Owensboro
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firstsecurity.net
Kentucky
Daviess
Owensboro
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34524
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34524
FDIC's unique number: 59031
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hopkinsville
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2586281
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-10
1997-08-20 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc.
2000-12-11 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2008-01-25 Acquired Warrick Interim Bank Inc. in Boonville, Indiana.
Total assets: $369,162,000
Total deposits: $291,139,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $291,139,000
Equity capital: $36,970,000
Net income: $1,359,000
Return on Assets: 0.77
Return on Equity: 7.59
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Security, Inc.
First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc. - Bowling Green Downtown
First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc. - Campbell Lane Office
First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc. - Evansville Branch
First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc. - First Security Bank Of
First Security Bank Of Owensboro, Inc. - Franklin Office
No associations
LandOfFree
First Security Bank of Owensboro, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Security Bank of Owensboro, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Bank of Owensboro, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24366