Texas – Travis – Austin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fsbcentex.com
Texas
Travis
Austin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
11151
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 11151
FDIC's unique number: 7117
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 751759
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 31
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-04
1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1988-09-12 Moved bank headquarters from Chilton, Texas to Temple, Texas.
1993-10-01 Acquired Salado National Bank in Salado, Texas.
1995-04-01 Acquired The Citizens State Bank Of Lometa in Lometa, Texas.
1997-01-31 Acquired First National Bank in Goldthwaite, Texas.
1999-07-14 Changed name to First State Bank Central Texas .
2005-10-13 Acquired First National Bank Of Hamilton in Hamilton, Texas.
2007-12-10 Moved bank headquarters from Temple, Texas to Austin, Texas.
2008-06-09 Acquired The First State Bank in Granger, Texas.
Total assets: $1,060,231,000
Total deposits: $844,301,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $844,301,000
Equity capital: $132,070,000
Net income: $4,784,000
Return on Assets: 0.9
Return on Equity: 7.63
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Central Community Corporation
First State Bank Central Texas - 1301 Fisher Street Branch
First State Bank Central Texas - 6th Street Branch
First State Bank Central Texas - Academy Branch
First State Bank Central Texas - Bartlett Branch
First State Bank Central Texas - Belton Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank Central Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank Central Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank Central Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27360