Texas – Victoria – Victoria
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.firstvictoria.com
Texas
Victoria
Victoria
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
5570
1867
FDIC Certificate Number: 5570
FDIC's unique number: 3790
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 488167
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 10360
Number of Domestic Offices: 26
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1867-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Victoria National Bank.
1985-05-31 Reorganized.
1998-09-17 Reorganized.
2000-04-14 Reorganized.
2000-04-24 Acquired Mid-coast Savings Bank, SSB in Edna, Texas.
2003-11-07 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Texas, National Association in New Waverly, Texas.
2005-08-31 Acquired Planters & Merchants State Bank in Hearne, Texas.
Total assets: $1,778,707,000
Total deposits: $1,574,430,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,574,430,000
Equity capital: $180,497,000
Net income: $8,008,000
Return on Assets: 0.91
Return on Equity: 9.05
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Mow/Rpw Ii, Ltd.
First Victoria National Bank - Bryan - Tejas Center Branch
First Victoria National Bank - Bryan Branch
First Victoria National Bank - Calallen Branch
First Victoria National Bank - Cinco Ranch Branch
First Victoria National Bank - College Station - Crescent Pointe
No associations
LandOfFree
First Victoria National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Victoria National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Victoria National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1188