North Dakota – Cass – Fargo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.gatecitybank.com
North Dakota
Cass
Fargo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
27774
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 27774
FDIC's unique number: 40608
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Fargo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 657271
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 7E5
Number of Domestic Offices: 31
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Gate City Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1986-06-30 Changed name to Gate City Federal Savings Bank .
1986-06-30 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2000-06-26 Changed name to Gate City Bank .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $1,288,337,000
Total deposits: $1,124,718,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,124,718,000
Equity capital: $151,118,000
Net income: $4,709,000
Return on Assets: 0.75
Return on Equity: 6.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Gate City Bank - 101 East Main St Branch
Gate City Bank - 1017 S. Broadway Branch
Gate City Bank - 11 1st St Se Branch
Gate City Bank - 111 South Main St Branch
Gate City Bank - 1501 S. University Drive Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Gate City Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Gate City Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Gate City Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19047