Kentucky – Grant – Williamstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.gcdb.net
Kentucky
Grant
Williamstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
9311
1882
FDIC Certificate Number: 9311
FDIC's unique number: 5966
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 489016
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1882-02-02 Institution established. Original name: Grant County Deposit Bank.
1985-01-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $88,008,000
Total deposits: $70,635,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $70,635,000
Equity capital: $10,018,000
Net income: $-56,000
Return on Assets: -0.13
Return on Equity: -1.13
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Grant County Bancorp, Inc.
Grant County Deposit Bank - Corinth Branch
Grant County Deposit Bank - Crittenden Branch
Grant County Deposit Bank - Grant County Deposit Bank
Grant County Deposit Bank - Jonesville Branch
Grant County Deposit Bank - Taft Highway Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Grant County Deposit Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Grant County Deposit Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Grant County Deposit Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22656