Kentucky – Hancock – Hawesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.hancockbankonline.com
Kentucky
Hancock
Hawesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
8128
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 8128
FDIC's unique number: 5176
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hopkinsville
Federal Reserve ID Number: 545846
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-03
1888-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Hancock Bank & Trust Company.
2005-01-01 Acquired Breckinridge Bank in Cloverport, Kentucky.
2008-03-31 Acquired Community First Bank in Madisonville, Kentucky.
2009-12-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $345,473,000
Total deposits: $300,969,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $300,969,000
Equity capital: $30,540,000
Net income: $369,000
Return on Assets: 0.21
Return on Equity: 2.6
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Hancock Bancorp, Inc.
Hancock Bank & Trust Company - Bowling Green Branch
Hancock Bank & Trust Company - Breckinridge Bank Branch
Hancock Bank & Trust Company - Hancock Bank & Trust Company
Hancock Bank & Trust Company - Lewisport Branch
Hancock Bank & Trust Company - Madisonville North Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Hancock Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Hancock Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Hancock Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9025