Kansas – Greenwood – Eureka
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.homebank-trust.com
Kansas
Greenwood
Eureka
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
4664
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 4664
FDIC's unique number: 3098
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wichita
Federal Reserve ID Number: 840251
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1904-08-04 Institution established. Original name: The Home National Bank Of Eureka.
1977-04-01 Changed name to Home Bank And Trust Company Of Eureka .
1989-07-28 Acquired Severy State Bank in Severy, Kansas.
1989-07-28 Changed name to Home Bank And Trust Company .
Total assets: $81,894,000
Total deposits: $69,188,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $69,188,000
Equity capital: $5,709,000
Net income: $242,000
Return on Assets: 0.61
Return on Equity: 8.54
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Greenwood County Financial Services, Inc.
Home Bank And Trust Company - 10421 West Central Branch
Home Bank And Trust Company - Clearwater Branch
Home Bank And Trust Company - East Wichita Branch
Home Bank And Trust Company - Home Bank And Trust Company
Home Bank And Trust Company - Home Ii Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Home Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Home Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20268