Kentucky – Boyd – Ashland
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.hfsl.com
Kentucky
Boyd
Ashland
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
29877
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 29877
FDIC's unique number: 42711
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1011076
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 70424
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-09-28
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Home Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1983-03-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Louisa, Kentucky.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2011-09-12 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
Total assets: $298,195,000
Total deposits: $241,774,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $241,774,000
Equity capital: $29,105,000
Net income: $980,000
Return on Assets: 0.67
Return on Equity: 6.96
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Home Federal Savings And Loan Association - Flatwoods Branch
Home Federal Savings And Loan Association - Greenup Branch
Home Federal Savings And Loan Association - Home Federal Savings
Home Federal Savings And Loan Association - Louisa Branch
Home Federal Savings And Loan Association - South Shore Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Home Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Home Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26916