Minnesota – Olmsted – Rochester
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.justcallhome.com
Minnesota
Olmsted
Rochester
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
29042
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29042
FDIC's unique number: 41876
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 796572
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 703E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 14
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1934-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Home Federal Savings Bank.
1994-06-29 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1997-12-06 Acquired Marshalltown Savings Bank, Fsb in Marshalltown, Iowa.
2001-09-17 Moved bank headquarters from Spring Valley, Minnesota to Rochester, Minnesota.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $807,336,000
Total deposits: $648,313,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $648,313,000
Equity capital: $67,070,000
Net income: $-1,288,000
Return on Assets: -0.3
Return on Equity: -3.79
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Home Federal Savings Bank - 1 Spring Valley Branch
Home Federal Savings Bank - 10 Toledo Branch
Home Federal Savings Bank - 13 Rochester - 55th Street Branch
Home Federal Savings Bank - 15 Edina Branch
Home Federal Savings Bank - 17 Rochester - 1st Ave Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Home Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Home Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1072